Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Procurements
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Failed (21-25)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that procurements made through competitive sealed bids or competitive sealed proposals by the State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency be awarded to the responsible bidder or offeror who submits the lowest responsive bid or proposal under specified circumstances.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Procurements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {254735/1
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {254735/1
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted (25-21)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Procurements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {513529/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (21-25)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Third Reading Failed (21-25)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Procurements
Senate 3/16/2017 3/17/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments {254735/1 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments {254735/1 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Committee Amendment Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments Adopted (25-21) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Procurements
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Floor Amendment {513529/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (21-25) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Third Reading Failed (21-25) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page