Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Dentistry Act - Scope of Practice and Penalties for Violations
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from being considered to be practicing dentistry or violating specified provisions of law based solely on whether the person provides specified services or engages in specified acts; providing that specified provisions of law do not prohibit a dentist or dental practice from contracting to receive specified services or benefiting from specified acts; altering specified penalties for specified acts related to the unauthorized practice of dentistry; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1584
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Maryland Dentistry Act - Scope of Practice and Penalties for Violations
Senate 2/28/2017 3/01/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-101, 4-301, 4-601, 4-606 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM