Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Absentee Ballot Requests, Delivery, and Marking
Sponsored by
Senator Kasemeyer
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Elections approved absentee ballot application to require the applicant to provide certain information; repealing a provision of law requiring a local board of elections to provide an absentee ballot by facsimile transmission if requested by a voter; altering a certain provision of law to require a local board to provide an absentee ballot by the Internet only if requested by certain uniformed services voters or overseas voters or certain voters with a disability, rather than to any voter on request; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1658
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Absentee Ballot Requests, Delivery, and Marking
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Election Law - Absentee Ballot Requests, Delivery, and Marking
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-305, 9-306, 9-308.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM