Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City Community College - Realignment
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Ferguson, and McFadden
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 848
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Board of Trustees of the Baltimore City Community College; requiring the chair of the Board to be appointed by the President of the Senate and the Speaker of the House of Delegates; requiring the Board to analyze programs, priorities, student needs, budgetary projections, staffing, information technology requirements, the status of real estate holdings, and the efficiency of the College's operations; prohibiting the Board from appointing a new President of the College except under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1595
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City Community College - Restructuring
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {394736/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {283724/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City Community College - Realignment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 848
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City Community College - Realignment
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Baltimore City Community College - Restructuring
Senate 2/28/2017 3/01/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable with Amendments {394736/1 Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Floor Amendment {283724/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Text - Third - Baltimore City Community College - Realignment
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 56
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 61
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 65
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 848
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City Community College - Realignment
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-504, 16-505, 16-505.1, 16-505.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM