Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County Sheriff - Collective Bargaining
Sponsored by
Senators Young and Hough
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 712
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the County Executive of Frederick County may not be a party to specified collective bargaining agreements but may attend and participate in all collective bargaining sessions of specified deputy sheriffs and correctional officers of the Frederick County Sheriff's Office.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1556
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (124-11)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 712
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2016 2/26/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/01/2016 3/02/2016 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Hearing 3/18 at 12:30 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Second Reading Passed 51
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 52
House 3/28/2016 3/23/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 55A
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (124-11) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 712
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM