Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Substance Use Disorder Treatment - Licensing of Outpatient Programs and Provision of Naloxone Kits
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene from requiring, under specified circumstances, that an outpatient substance use disorder treatment program be granted specified accreditation as a condition of licensure; requiring each hospital emergency department to establish and implement a policy of providing a naloxone kit to patients admitted for an opioid overdose and training the patients in the proper method of administering the naloxone before the patient is released; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Substance Use Disorder Treatment - Licensing of Outpatient Programs and Provision of Naloxone Kits
Senate 2/28/2017 3/01/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7.5-402, 8-1101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM