Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Volunteer Emergency Responders - Benefits Under Blanket Policies and Contracts
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Excluding, from specified provisions of State insurance laws, specified blanket health insurance policies and contracts that provide health insurance benefits to specified volunteer emergency responders; providing that the blanket health insurance policies and contracts are subject to specified provisions of State insurance laws; requiring the blanket health insurance policies and contracts to disclose that the policies and contracts do not provide comprehensive health coverage; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Health Insurance - Volunteer Emergency Responders - Benefits Under Blanket Policies and Contracts
Senate 2/28/2017 3/01/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1107, 15-301, 15-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM