Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric Cooperatives - Rate Regulation - Fixed Charges for Distribution System Costs
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing an electric cooperative to propose a fixed charge for specified fixed costs; requiring the fixed charge to be applied in a specified manner; prohibiting an electric cooperative from proposing an increase to a fixed charge that is more than 25% greater than the fixed charge in effect 1 year before the effective date of the proposed increase; specifying the manner in which an electric cooperative may propose a fixed charge; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM