Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Research and Development Credit - Start-Up Businesses
Sponsored by
Senator Oaks
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of a specified credit against the State income tax for Maryland qualified research and development expenses incurred by an individual or a corporation so as to allow the individual or corporation, subject to specified limitations, a credit in an amount equal to 5% of the Maryland qualified research and development expenses paid to a specified start-up business or paid or incurred by the individual or corporation during the taxable year, if the individual or corporation is a specified start-up business; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1176
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Research and Development Credit - Start-Up Businesses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Income Tax - Research and Development Credit - Start-Up Businesses
Senate 2/23/2017 2/24/2017 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-721 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM