Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Commercial Bingo - Permits
Sponsored by
Senators Conway and Ferguson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a commercial instant bingo permit in Baltimore City; authorizing the Bureau of Revenue Collections to issue a permit to an entity that meets specified requirements; specifying that for commercial purposes the permit holder may resume operating games of instant bingo in a specified manner under specified circumstances; and requiring the Bureau to adopt regulations to carry out the Act.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2016 3/02/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-502, 13-507, 13-511 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM