Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2018
Sponsored by
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting recent high school graduates from payment of tuition to attend a community college in the State under certain circumstances; providing a 50% discount on tuition to individuals who do not have a high school diploma or GED and have been unemployed for at least 6 months but who have been seeking employment and who are attending a community college and seeking vocational certificates or associate's degrees; requiring the State to reimburse community colleges for foregone tuition revenue; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1203
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2018
Senate 3/08/2018 3/09/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-106.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM