Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Corporate Headquarters Investment and Job Retention Tax Credit
Sponsored by
Senators King, Feldman, Kagan, Lee, Madaleno, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a qualified business entity operating an eligible corporate headquarters project to claim a specified credit against the State income tax; requiring the Department of Commerce to certify a business entity as a qualified business entity within 60 days of receiving a specified application; providing that a project is eligible for designation by the Department as an eligible tax credit project under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Income Tax - Corporate Headquarters Investment and Job Retention Tax Credit
Senate 2/23/2017 2/24/2017 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 2.5-109, 6-801 through 6-807 )
(   10-741 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM