Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Behavioral Health Treatment Account and Funding for Substance Use Treatment Services
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m. ( Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Cigarette Restitution Fund to include a separate account to be used for substance use treatment, with priority given to residential treatment services, recovery support housing, and specified crisis response services, and for rate adjustments for specified agencies or programs; requiring specified distributions from the account to be used to supplement and not supplant specified other funds; prohibiting more than $10,000,000 from being appropriated from the account in any fiscal year; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1618
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m. ( Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/02/2016 3/03/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Finance
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m. ( Budget and Taxation)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM