Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Maximum Benefit - Increase
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton and Kelley
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the maximum weekly unemployment insurance benefit amount; applying the Act to all claims filed establishing a new benefit year on or after January 2, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1633
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {487277/1
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Serafini) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {487277/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Serafini) {203320/1 Rejected (17-27)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-16)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/02/2016 3/03/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {487277/1 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Serafini) Adopted 61
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {487277/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Serafini) {203320/1 Rejected (17-27) 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (30-16) 63
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 67
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM