Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County Boards of Education - Leasing of School Property
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing certain exceptions to the requirement that certain public school property must be held in trust by a county board of education; authorizing a county or a county board to lease certain property; and excluding certain lease payments made by a county board of education from the maintenance of effort calculation.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - County Boards of Education - Leasing of School Property
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Reassigned to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - County Boards of Education - Leasing of School Property
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Reassigned to Budget and Taxation 36
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-114, 4-126, 5-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM