Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - State Grant to Counties With Declining Student Enrollment
Sponsored by
Senator McFadden
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the criteria for a county board of education to be eligible for a specified State grant for fiscal years 2015 through 2018; requiring specified county boards of education to receive specified grants under specified circumstances; declaring the intent of the General Assembly that the Governor transfer funds to a county board in a specified fiscal year under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0209
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/02/2016 3/03/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM