Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Study
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Clean Energy Center and the University of Maryland Energy Research Center jointly to conduct a study on the renewable energy portfolio standard and related matters; providing for the scope of the study; providing specific subjects for the study to address; requiring specified State and local units to cooperate with the centers in the conduct of the study; requiring the centers to report to the Governor and specified committees on or before specified dates; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1414
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Study
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Study
Senate 2/28/2017 3/01/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-701, 7-714 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM