Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - School Construction - Approval, Design, and Funding
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Public Works to adopt regulations that direct the Interagency Committee on School Construction to establish timelines for certain public school construction approvals and to establish certain standard design models for the construction of elementary, middle, and high schools; and requiring the Board of Public Works to adopt regulations that establish per-pupil State school construction funding amounts under certain conditions.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - School Construction - Approval, Design, and Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Schools - School Construction - Approval, Design, and Funding
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM