Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Maryland Sports and Affiliated Foundations - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson, Astle, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Mathias, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Veto sustained (0-44)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Sports office in the Maryland Stadium Authority; requiring Maryland Sports to implement a program to bring regional, national, and international sporting events to the State in order to maximize utilization of sports facilities, to enhance economic development, and to promote the State as a sporting events destination; requiring the State Ethics Commission to review the Authority's policies on conflicts of interest and approve them, if appropriate, to govern specified officials and employees; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1619
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {247770/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {577472/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {594668/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2017
Legislative Date
5/26/2017
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Veto sustained (0-44)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Maryland Stadium Authority - Maryland Sports and Affiliated Foundations - Establishment
Senate 2/28/2017 3/01/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {247770/1 Adopted 50
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Floor Committee Amendment {577472/1 Adopted 50
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Maryland Stadium Authority - Maryland Sports and Affiliated Foundations - Establishment
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 51
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 55
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {594668/1 Adopted 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (116-0) 68
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Stadium Authority - Maryland Sports and Affiliated Foundations - Establishment
Post Passage 5/26/2017 5/26/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Veto sustained (0-44)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-604, 10-611, 10-612 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM