Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Fees and Enforcement
Sponsored by
Senator McFadden
Status
In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the annual fee required to be paid to the Department of the Environment for specified affected properties from $30 to $75; increasing the processing fee required to be submitted with a report that a rental dwelling unit is lead free from $10 to $75; requiring the Department to use the additional revenue from the increase in fees for a specified purpose; and requiring the Department to report to the General Assembly, on or before October 1 each year, on the implementation of the Act.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0810
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/03/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings 43
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-843 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM