Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Maryland Transit Administration - Transit Services for Public School Students
Sponsored by
Senators Oaks, Benson, Feldman, Guzzone, Klausmeier, Mathias, Reilly, Rosapepe, Smith, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 785
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to provide ridership on transit vehicles to eligible students in Baltimore City public schools between the hours of 5 a.m. and 8 p.m. only for school-related activities; prohibiting the Administration from collecting any fees for the services; requiring Baltimore City and the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners to submit a report to the Governor and General Assembly by December 1, 2018, on the school system's financial condition and the impact of the transportation services provided; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1132
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Transit Administration - Free Ridership for State Employees
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {937078/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {863425/1 (Senator Middleton)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {863425/1 (Senator Middleton)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {863425/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted (32-13)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {163527/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-15)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {663629/1 (Delegate Rey) Rejected (50-85)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-49)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 785
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Maryland Transit Administration - Free Ridership for State Employees
Senate 2/28/2017 3/01/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments {937078/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Floor Amendment {863425/1 (Senator Middleton) 52
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted 52
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Floor Amendment {863425/1 (Senator Middleton) 53
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 53
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Floor Amendment {863425/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted (32-13) 54
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Floor Amendment {163527/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 54
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Maryland Transit Administration - Transit Services for Public School Students
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Third Reading Passed (31-15) 55
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 60
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Floor Amendment {663629/1 (Delegate Rey) Rejected (50-85) 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (87-49) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 785
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Maryland Transit Administration - Transit Services for Public School Students
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM