Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hearing- or Speech-Impaired Children - Sign Language Instruction for Parents and Guardians
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring an individualized education program for a child with a hearing or speech impairment to include educating the child's parents or guardians in basic sign language; requiring that the Maryland Infants and Toddlers Program include resources such as basic sign language education, digital teaching tools, and online instruction for specified parents or guardians; altering the name of the universal newborn screening program to be the universal newborn screening and parental education program; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Hearing- or Speech-Impaired Children - Sign Language Instruction for Parents and Guardians
Senate 3/16/2017 3/17/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-408.1, 8-416 )
(   19-308.5 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM