Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Biotechnology Investment Incentive Tax Credit - Alteration
Sponsored by
Senator King
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "qualified Maryland biotechnology company" to repeal certain limitations on the period of time for which a company may have been in active business for purposes of eligibility for the biotechnology tax credit; declaring the intent of the General Assembly that the credit will encourage private sector investment in Maryland biotechnology companies; altering a certain limitation on the aggregate credits that the Secretary of Commerce may certify for certain investments; applying the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Income Tax - Biotechnology Investment Incentive Tax Credit - Alteration
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-725 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM