Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption
Sponsored by
Carroll County Senators
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding certain counties to the list of counties that exempt agricultural buildings engaged in agritourism from a certain permit requirement; providing for the number of people allowed to occupy a building engaged in agritourism in certain counties under certain circumstances; and making a technical correction.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1116
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {944138/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {733924/1 (Harford County Senators) Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments {944138/1 Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Floor Amendment {733924/1 (Harford County Senators) Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 4/05/2018 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
(   12-508 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page