Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Handgun Permits - Criminal History Check - Fingerprint Submission Exception
Sponsored by
Senator Ready
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that the Secretary of State Police is not required to submit certain fingerprints with a certain application for a criminal history records check under certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1534
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Handgun Permits - Criminal History Check - Fingerprint Submission Exception
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301, 5-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM