Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax – Film Production Activity Tax Credit – Alterations
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Currie, DeGrange, Kasemeyer, King, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "film production activity" to include each season of a television series; excluding certain activities from eligibility for the film production tax credit program; authorizing a Maryland small or independent film entity to qualify as a film production entity; prohibiting the Secretary of Commerce from issuing tax credit certificates in excess of $10,000,000 for a single film production activity; requiring the Secretary to make 10% of the credit amount authorized available to Maryland small film entities; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1449
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax – Film Production Activity Tax Credit – Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {239034/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax – Film Production Activity Tax Credit – Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {405165/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {733228/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (46-84)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-36)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-6)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Income Tax – Film Production Activity Tax Credit – Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Income Tax – Film Production Activity Tax Credit – Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Income Tax – Film Production Activity Tax Credit – Alterations
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {239034/1 Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax – Film Production Activity Tax Credit – Alterations
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Ways and Means 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {405165/1 Adopted 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Floor Amendment {733228/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (46-84) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (97-36) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (39-6) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Income Tax – Film Production Activity Tax Credit – Alterations
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595
Text - Chapter - Income Tax – Film Production Activity Tax Credit – Alterations
(   10-730 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page