Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Earned Income Tax Credit - Notice of Availability
Sponsored by
Senator Oaks
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Comptroller, beginning January 1, 2018, to provide specified written and electronic notice of the availability of credits against the State and federal income taxes for earned income; requiring that specified written notice be included in specified income tax return materials in a specified manner; requiring that specified electronic notice be posted on the Internet tax filing system of the Comptroller in a specified manner; requiring the Comptroller to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1583
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Earned Income Tax Credit - Notice of Availability
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Income Tax - Earned Income Tax Credit - Notice of Availability
Senate 2/28/2017 3/01/2017 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM