Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Construction Contracts - Retention Proceeds
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an owner to provide a certain contractor with an itemized list of work remaining to be done and a cost estimate within 45 days after the owner takes possession of or otherwise puts a project into use; requiring an owner to pay certain excess retention proceeds to a contractor under certain circumstances; requiring a contractor to provide a certain subcontractor with a certain itemized list and cost estimate within 10 days after receiving a certain payment; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Construction Contracts - Retention Proceeds
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Real Property - Construction Contracts - Retention Proceeds
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM