Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Company - Easement - Policy and Notice for Performing Work
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each public service company to establish a policy and procedures for performing work on property subject to the public service company's easement; requiring that a specified policy and procedures provide that a public service company that has not entered onto property subject to a specified easement within the past 2 years to provide 2 months' notice to the property owner of land subject to a specified easement before performing any work on the property.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {997377/1
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Rereferred to Finance (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
56A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2016 3/07/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/30/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable with Amendments {997377/1 56A
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Rereferred to Finance (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 56A
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM