Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City Board of License Commissioners - Members - Terms and Appointment
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Nathan-Pulliam, Ferguson, Gladden, McFadden, and Pugh
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 26
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor, when evaluating an applicant for membership on the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City, to consider the need for geographic, political, racial, ethnic, cultural, and gender diversity on the Board; requiring the Governor to make an appointment to fill a vacancy on the Board within 15 days after the vacancy occurs; repealing the requirement that the Governor appoint all of the members of the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {904636/1
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {904636/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-2)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-46)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 26
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Conway) Adopted 38
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 38
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {904636/1 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 44
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments {904636/1 Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (43-2) 46
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 47
House 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 52
House 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Second Reading Passed 52
House 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Third Reading Passed (90-46) 53
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Returned Passed 51
Post Passage 4/07/2016 4/07/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 26
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-101, 15-110 )
(   12-102, 12-202, 12-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM