Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Education - Career Exploration and Development Activities - Coffee (Java Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Salling
Status
In the House - Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting an Executive Branch agency from banning or regulating the sale of coffee in conjunction with a career exploration and development activity in a public high school in Baltimore County.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0349
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {744336/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-4)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/30/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable with Amendments {744336/1 Report Adopted 56A
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56A
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (41-4) 57
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 59
House 4/05/2016 4/05/2016 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/06/2016 4/06/2016 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-423.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM