Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - South Baltimore Gateway Community Benefits District and Distribution of Local Impact Grants
Sponsored by
Senator Ferguson
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-2)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to establish specified community benefits district management authorities to include the South Baltimore Gateway Community Benefits District; requiring the ordinance establishing the South Baltimore Gateway Community Benefits District Management Authority to address specified matters; requiring, starting in fiscal year 2018, at least 50% of local impact grants from video lottery proceeds to be distributed to the Authority; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1636
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 3 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {499430/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Luedtke) {303023/1 Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-2)
Proceedings
69
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments {499430/1 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 61
House 4/06/2016 4/06/2016 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/07/2016 4/07/2016 Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 68
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Luedtke) {303023/1 Adopted 68
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-2) 69
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM