Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement – Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprise Participation
Sponsored by
Senator Waugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 740
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "veteran" for purposes of certain provisions of law governing veteran-owned small business enterprise participation in procurement to include only individuals who are verified by the State Department of Veterans Affairs as having served on active duty in the armed forces of the United States, other than for training and were discharged or released under conditions other than dishonorable; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1760
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Kipke) Adopted (138-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 740
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Procurement – Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprise Participation
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Procurement – Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprise Participation
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Adopted 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Kipke) Adopted (138-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Second Reading Passed 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 740
Text - Chapter - Procurement – Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprise Participation
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page