Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel
Sponsored by
Senators Manno, Astle, Benson, Cassilly, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Edwards, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Kagan, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Mathias, McFadden, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, Peters, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Rosapepe, Serafini, Waugh, Young, and Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax under specified circumstances for specified retirement income attributable to a resident's employment as a law enforcement officer or the individual's service as fire, rescue, or emergency services personnel; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0227
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Manno) Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Manno) Adopted 41
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Referred Senate Rules 41
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM