Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Designations - The Preakness Stakes as the State Cultural Event
Sponsored by
Senators Oaks and Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Designating the Preakness Stakes as the State cultural event.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1657
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Designations - The Preakness Stakes as the State Cultural Event
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - State Designations - The Preakness Stakes as the State Cultural Event
Senate 3/09/2017 3/10/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM