Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Administrative Procedure Act - Proposed Regulation - Explanatory Reasons Justifying Adoption
Sponsored by
Senator Manno
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a promulgating unit to include, under specified circumstances, clearly written explanatory reasons with the submission of a proposed regulation to the Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review and the Department of Legislative Services.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1631
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Manno) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Manno) Adopted 45
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Referred Senate Rules 45
Senate 3/22/2016 3/23/2016 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/06/2016 4/06/2016 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-101, 10-110 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM