Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Next Generation Scholars of Maryland
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Pugh, McFadden, Ferguson, and Nathan-Pulliam
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering specified criteria for prequalification of a student for a Guaranteed Access Grant; altering the name of the College Readiness Outreach Program to be the Next Generation Scholars of Maryland Program; providing the purpose of the Program is to give guidance and services to students and to assist students in completing college preparatory curricula, graduating from high school, matriculating at an institution of higher education, and making timely progress to complete a degree program; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1403
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {884636/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-8)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-43)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/18/2017 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Conway) Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Conway) Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments {884636/2 Report Adopted 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (37-8) 55
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 58
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (90-43) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-303, 18-303.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM