Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Seed Community Development Anchor Institution Fund
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Conway, McFadden, Ferguson, and Nathan-Pulliam
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Seed Community Development Anchor Institution Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying that the purpose of the Fund is to provide grants and loans to anchor institutions for community development projects in blighted areas of the State; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to administer the Fund; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $5,000,000 to the Fund for fiscal years 2018 through 2022; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1400
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {609035/1
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {609035/1
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {609035/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {673128/1 Rejected (15-30)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-13)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-47)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/18/2017 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Pugh) Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Pugh) Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Referred Budget and Taxation 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {609035/1 53
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 53
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments {609035/1 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments {609035/1 Report Adopted 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {673128/1 Rejected (15-30) 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (32-13) 55
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 58
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Third Reading Passed (89-47) 65
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM