Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 5 Breweries - Barrelage and Hours of Sale
Sponsored by
Senator Bates
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that a local licensing board grant an on-site consumption permit under specified conditions; altering the amount of beer that a holder of a Class 5 brewery license may sell for on-premises consumption; and specifying hours of sale for beer sold for on-premises consumption, unless the hours are otherwise determined by the local licensing board for the jurisdiction in which the Class 5 brewery is located.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 5 Breweries - Barrelage and Hours of Sale
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 5 Breweries - Barrelage and Hours of Sale
Senate 3/09/2017 3/10/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM