Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education Degree and Job Certification Without Debt Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Conway, King, and Madaleno
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include $250,000 in the State budget for fiscal years 2019 through 2023 for the Maryland Higher Education Commission to establish a near completer communication campaign; requiring the Commission to develop and implement a specified Web-based match program for near completers; establishing the Maryland Community College Promise Program to provide an opportunity for community college students to earn an associate's degree or certificate debt free; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Higher Education Degree and Job Certification Without Debt Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Higher Education Degree and Job Certification Without Debt Act of 2017
Senate 3/09/2017 3/10/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-209, 15-106.5, 16-317, 16-514, 16-701 through 16-707, 18-107, 18-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM