Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Maryland Sportsmanship Month
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim March as Maryland Sportsmanship Month; requiring the proclamation to urge local recreation and parks departments in the State to observe Maryland Sportsmanship Month with appropriate programs, ceremonies, and activities; and specifying examples of appropriate programs, ceremonies, and activities.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1298
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Maryland Sportsmanship Month
Senate 3/08/2018 3/09/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-503, 7-503 through 7-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM