Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Repeal of Sentencing Proceeding
Sponsored by
Senators Cassilly, Brochin, Hough, Norman, and Ready
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing specified provisions of law that provide a separate jury proceeding to determine whether a person convicted of murder in the first degree is sentenced to imprisonment for life without the possibility of parole or imprisonment for life; establishing that a court may sentence a person convicted of murder in the first degree to imprisonment for life without the possibility of parole without the requirement of a separate jury sentencing procedure under specified circumstances; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0157 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 41
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Senate Rules 41
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Repeal of Sentencing Proceeding
Senate 3/16/2017 3/17/2017 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed 55
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Repeal of Sentencing Proceeding
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Motion Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 56
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 58
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-201, 2-203, 2-304, 2-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM