Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Wireless Facilities - Permitting and Siting
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a local government from entering into certain types of exclusive agreements under certain circumstances; authorizing a local government to impose certain rates and fees for certain purposes under certain circumstances; authorizing a wireless provider to collocate certain wireless facilities and poles in certain places under certain circumstances; providing that certain uses of land are permitted uses and not subject to local zoning review or approval; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1767
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Wireless Facilities - Permitting and Siting
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Wireless Facilities - Permitting and Siting
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-1501 through 1-1511 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM