Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Unemployment Insurance - Independent Contractors and Severance Pay
Sponsored by
Senators Manno and Middleton
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying factors that must be evidenced in order for the Secretary of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to be satisfied that the work that an individual performs under a specified contract is not covered employment for purposes of the unemployment insurance law; and providing for the application of specified provisions of law governing the effect of dismissal payments or wages in lieu of notice on unemployment benefits.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Manno) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Manno) Adopted 44
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Referred Senate Rules 44
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Unemployment Insurance - Independent Contractors and Severance Pay
Senate 3/16/2017 3/17/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2017 3/28/2017 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-1009, 8-205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM