Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Controlled Water Ski Areas in Maynadier Creek - Operation of Vessel - Hours of Operation
Sponsored by
Anne Arundel County Senators
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to operate or give permission to operate a vessel for the purpose of towing a water skier in a ski slalom course located in a controlled water ski area located in Maynadier Creek on specified days between the hours of 6:00 a.m. and 8:30 p.m.; and prohibiting a person from operating or giving permission to operate a vessel for specified purposes in a ski slalom course located in a controlled water ski area located in Maynadier Creek on specified days and State holidays.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {664036/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
63
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Reilly) Adopted 44
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Referred Senate Rules 44
Text - First - Controlled Water Ski Areas in Maynadier Creek - Operation of Vessel - Prohibition
Senate 3/16/2017 3/17/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments {664036/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Controlled Water Ski Areas in Maynadier Creek - Operation of Vessel - Hours of Operation
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 63
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-725.1, 8-725.1 through 8-725.7 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM