Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Blood Lead Level
Sponsored by
Senator Oaks
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the elevated blood lead level at which an owner of an affected property is required to satisfy the modified risk reduction standard; and altering the elevated blood lead level at which a local health department is required to notify specified persons.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1625
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Oaks) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Blood Lead Level
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Oaks) Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Senate Rules 46
Text - First - Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Blood Lead Level
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-819, 6-846 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM