Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Financing Purchase or Lease of Property - Exemption From Procurement Law
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting from the State procurement law the purchase or lease of property for a specified purpose by specified persons if the Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland makes a specified determination; and providing that existing obligations or contract rights may not be impaired by the Act.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Hearing 4/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Middleton) Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Senate Rules 46
Text - First - Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Financing Purchase or Lease of Property - Exemption From Procurement Law
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable Adopted 57
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Second Reading Passed 57
Text - Third - Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Financing Purchase or Lease of Property - Exemption From Procurement Law
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 63
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Hearing 4/10 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-601, 13-612.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM