Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Maryland Medical Cannabis Commission - Membership, Licensing, and Studies
Sponsored by
Senator Miller
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Natalie M. LaPrade Maryland Medical Cannabis Commission to actively seek, to the extent permitted by State and federal law, to achieve racial, ethnic, and geographic diversity when licensing medical cannabis growers, processors, and dispensaries and to strongly encourage and conduct outreach to small, minority-owned, and women-owned businesses for specified purposes; requiring the Commission to grant Stage One preapproval for a medical cannabis grower license to two specified applicants on or before July 1, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Peters) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/22/2017 3/20/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/22/2017 3/20/2017 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Peters) Adopted 49
Senate 3/22/2017 3/20/2017 Referred Senate Rules 49
Text - First - Public Health - Maryland Medical Cannabis Commission - Membership, Licensing, and Studies
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-3302, 13-3303, 13-3303.1, 13-3305.1, 13-3306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM