Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - Notice of Legislative Proposals
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 643
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City to give notice to the Mayor of Baltimore City, the Baltimore City Council, and community and residential groups in the City that have opted to receive notices from the Board, at least 3 months before the start of the regular session of the General Assembly each year, regarding any legislative proposal the Board intends to submit to the Baltimore City delegation to the General Assembly for introduction as a bill.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {733792/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 643
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - Notice of Legislative Proposals
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - Notice of Legislative Proposals
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Economic Matters 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2018 3/27/2018 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {733792/1 Adopted 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - Notice of Legislative Proposals
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 643
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - Notice of Legislative Proposals
(   12-102, 12-201, 12-211 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page