Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Sexual Assault Response Training - Requirements and Grant Program
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each institution of higher education, beginning in the 2018-2019 academic year, to annually provide certain sexual assault response training to certain employees, contractors, or enrolled students who may be involved in certain actions; requiring each institution of higher education to provide certain training for a minimum of 8 hours to certain employees; authorizing the institution of higher education to combine certain required training; requiring certain training to include certain information; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1238
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Higher Education - Sexual Assault Response Training - Requirements and Grant Program
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-601, 11-602, 11-603 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM